Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1102 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 1, 2022
Fiscal Note February 1, 2022
Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 9, 2022
Bill February 8, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 23, 2022

Amended

Bill March 16, 2022
Bill March 15, 2022