Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1133 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2022

                    Page 1 
February 1, 2022  HB 22-1133  
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Fiscal Note  
  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 22-0679  
Rep. Gray 
Sen. Winter  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
February 1, 2022 
House Business  
Erin Reynolds | 303-866-4146 
Erin.Reynolds@state.co.us  
Bill Topic: FAMILY AND MEDICAL LEAVE INSURANCE FUND  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☒ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill transfers $57.0 million from the General Fund to the Family and Medical Leave 
Insurance Fund to prepay state employer premiums to the Department of Labor and 
Employment.  It creates a one-time state transfer in FY 2022-23 and will reduce 
centrally appropriated costs for agencies by the same amount over approximately four 
fiscal years. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
The Family and Medical Leave Insurance Fund is continuously appropriated to the 
Department of Labor and Employment.  Depending on timing of the bill's passage, the 
bill may require a reduction from the Paid Family Medical Leave Initiative line within 
each agency budget of $4.9 million in FY 2022-23.   
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 22-1133 
 
 
 
Current Year 
FY 2021-22 
Budget Year 
FY 2022-23 
Out Year 
FY 2023-24 
Revenue 
 
-  	-        -        
Expenditures Centrally Appropriated
1
 	-  ($4,908,466)       ($9,816,932)       
 	Total Expenditures 	-  ($4,908,466)       ($9,816,932) 
Transfers 	General Fund ($57.0 million)        -        -        
 	Cash Funds $57.0 million        -        -        
 	Net Transfer 	$0        -        -        
Other Budget Impacts  	-  	-        -        
1 
The FY 2022-23 Total Compensation Request submitted by the Department of Personnel and Administration includes 
$4,908,466, as a POTS appropriation for a half-year of state employer Family and Medical Leave Insurance premiums, 
to be included in the FY 2022-23 Long Bill.  If this bill passes prior to the Long Bill, this reduction may not need to be 
appropriated in the bill, and will be adjusted in the Long Bill instead.    Page 2 
February 1, 2022  HB 22-1133  
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill transfers $57.0 million from the General Fund to the Family and Medical Leave Insurance 
Fund for advance payments into state employer accounts under the Paid Family and Medical Leave 
Insurance Act administered by the Division of Family and Medical Leave Insurance in the Colorado 
Department of Labor and Employment (CDLE).   
 
When those accounts have a $0 balance, the state will begin paying quarterly premiums. The division 
must report the manner in which it determines the state will receive credit for the advance payment 
to the Department of Personnel and Administration, the Office of State Planning and Budgeting, and 
the Joint Budget Committee by December 31, 2022.  The bill specifies that advance payments of 
premiums do not constitute indebtedness or a state liability and are exempt from the state’s fiscal 
rules. 
Background 
The Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program, administered by the CDLE, was approved by 
voters in November 2020 through citizen-initiated Proposition 118.  The program was created as an 
enterprise and its revenue does not count toward the state’s revenue limit under TABOR.  It requires 
employers and employees in Colorado to pay a payroll premium of 0.90 percent, with a minimum of 
half paid by the employer, beginning January 1, 2023, in order to finance paid family and medical 
leave insurance benefits.  Beginning January 1, 2024, eligible employees may receive up to 12 weeks 
of paid family and medical leave insurance benefits. Apart from a $1.5 million transfer from the 
General Fund to the Family and Medical Leave Insurance Fund, the program does not expect to 
receive funding until January 1, 2023, when premiums begin. 
State Transfers 
In the current FY 2021-22, the bill transfers $57.0 million from the General Fund to the Family and 
Medical Leave Insurance Fund. 
State Expenditures 
The advance payment of the state’s share of employer premiums will result in a reduction in state 
expenditures of $4,908,466 in FY 2022-23 (half-year impact) and a reduction of $9,816,932 in 
FY 2023-24, with ongoing reductions until the $57.0 million prepayment is drawn down.  As discussed 
in the Background section, these amounts represent the employer contribution of 0.90 percent of all 
appropriated positions within the state, appropriated through the “Paid Family Medical Leave 
Initiative” line within each agency budget.  
Other Budget Impacts 
The Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program is a state government enterprise, with revenue 
exempt from TABOR.  The fiscal note assumes that advance premium payments do not constitute 
grant funding for purposes of determining the program's enterprise status.  Page 3 
February 1, 2022  HB 22-1133  
 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect upon signature of the Governor, or upon becoming law without his signature.  
State Appropriations 
If this bill is passed after the FY 2022-23 Long Bill, it will requires a total reduction of $4,908,466 in the 
centrally appropriated POTS appropriation titled Paid Family Medical Leave Initiative, distributed 
within each agency budget. 
 
If this bill is enacted prior to passage of the Long Bill, it is assumed that the required adjustments in 
appropriations for this bill can be made as adjustments to the Long Bill, rather than includes as 
appropriations in this bill. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Information Technology Labor and Employment  
Personnel and Administration  Treasury 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.