Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1133 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 11, 2022
Fiscal Note April 8, 2022
Fiscal Note February 1, 2022
Bill January 21, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 4, 2022
Bill April 1, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2022

Amended

Bill April 29, 2022
Bill April 28, 2022