Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1133 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/08/2022

                    Page 1 
April 8, 2022  HB 22-1133  
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Revised Fiscal Note  
(replaces fiscal note dated February 1, 2022)  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 22-0679  
Rep. Gray; Caraveo 
Sen. Winter  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
April 8, 2022 
Senate Appropriations 
Erin Reynolds | 303-866-4146 
Erin.Reynolds@state.co.us  
Bill Topic: FAMILY & MEDICAL LEAVE INSURANCE FUND  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☒ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill transfers $57.0 million from the Revenue Loss Restoration Cash Fund to the 
Family and Medical Leave Insurance Fund to prepay state employer premiums to the 
Department of Labor and Employment.  It creates a one-time state transfer in 
FY 2021-22, will reduce centrally appropriated costs for agencies by the same amount 
over approximately four fiscal years, and will increase state revenue from interest 
earnings. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
The Family and Medical Leave Insurance Fund is continuously appropriated to the 
Department of Labor and Employment.  Depending on timing of the bill's passage, the 
bill may require an appropriation reduction from the Paid Family Medical Leave 
Initiative line within each agency budget totaling $4.9 million in FY 2022-23.   
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The revised fiscal note reflects the reengrossed bill. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 22-1133 
 
 
 
Current Year 
FY 2021-22 
Budget Year 
FY 2022-23 
Out Year 
FY 2023-24 
Revenue 	FAMLI Fund -  $0.5 million  $0.9 million  
 	Total Revenue  -  $0.5 million  $0.9 million  
Expenditures 	Centrally Appropriated -  ($4.9 million)       ($9.8 million)        
 	Total Expenditures -  ($4.9 million)       ($9.8 million)        
Transfers Revenue Loss Restoration Cash Fund
1
 ($57.0 million)        -        -        
 	FAMLI Fund $57.0 million        -        -        
 	Net Transfer $0        -        -        
Other Budget  -  -        -        
1 
Money in the Revenue Loss Restoration Cash Fund comes from federal ARPA funds.    Page 2 
April 8, 2022  HB 22-1133  
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill transfers $57.0 million from the Revenue Loss Restoration Cash Fund to the Family and 
Medical Leave Insurance Fund for advance payments into state employer accounts under the Paid 
Family and Medical Leave Insurance Act administered by the Division of Family and Medical Leave 
Insurance in the Colorado Department of Labor and Employment (CDLE). The credit for the advance 
payments will include interest earnings.  
 
When those accounts have a $0 balance, the state will begin paying quarterly premiums.  The division 
must report the manner in which it determines the state will receive credit for the advance payment 
and interest earnings to the Department of Personnel and Administration, the Office of State Planning 
and Budgeting, and the Joint Budget Committee by December 31, 2022.  The bill specifies that advance 
payments of premiums do not constitute indebtedness or a state liability and are exempt from the 
state’s fiscal rules. 
Background 
The Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program, administered by the CDLE, was approved by 
voters in November 2020 through citizen-initiated Proposition 118.  The program was created as an 
enterprise and its revenue does not count toward the state’s revenue limit under TABOR.  It requires 
employers and employees in Colorado to pay a payroll premium of 0.90 percent, with a minimum of 
half paid by the employer, beginning January 1, 2023, in order to finance paid family and medical 
leave insurance benefits.  Premiums are capped at the Social Security Wage Base.  Beginning 
January 1, 2024, eligible employees may receive up to 12 weeks of paid family and medical leave 
insurance benefits. Apart from a $1.5 million transfer from the General Fund to the Family and 
Medical Leave Insurance Fund made through Senate 21-251, the program does not expect to receive 
funding until January 1, 2023, when premiums collections begin. If House Bill 22-1305 is adopted, the 
program will also receive up to $57.5 million General Fund to backfill a 0.90 percent premium 
reduction for all employers from January 1, 2023, through June 30, 2023, through a transfer made on 
July 1, 2023. For more information about the program, see:  famli.colorado.gov. 
State Revenue 
The bill will increase state revenue from interest earnings by about $0.5 million in FY 2022-23 
(half-year impact) and $0.9 million in FY 2023-24.  This revenue is received in the Family and Medical 
Leave Insurance Fund and credited toward the state’s prepayments of employee family and medical 
leave premiums. Overall, the prepayment of $57 million is expected to generate about $3.4 million 
over a six-year period while it is held in the fund and drawn down over time for premium payments.  
It is assumed that interest earnings in this fund are not subject to the state’s TABOR revenue limit.   
 
These estimates assume a 2.0 percent annual interest rate, compounded monthly, and quarterly 
withdrawals from the prepayment amount for premium payments until the balance is exhausted. 
Note that this fiscal note does not account for a corresponding reduction in interest earnings that may 
be received by the Revenue Loss Restoration Cash Fund, as it is unknown if the $57 million would 
otherwise be spent or held in that fund for some period of time.  
  Page 3 
April 8, 2022  HB 22-1133  
 
 
State Transfers 
In the current FY 2021-22, the bill transfers $57.0 million from the Revenue Loss Restoration Cash 
Fund to the Family and Medical Leave Insurance Fund. 
State Expenditures 
The advance payment of the state’s share of employer premiums will result in a reduction in state 
expenditures of $4,908,466 in FY 2022-23 (half-year impact) and a reduction of $9,816,932 in 
FY 2023-24, with ongoing reductions until the $57.0 million prepayment, plus interest earnings, is 
drawn down. Based on the assumed interest earnings and holding premium payments constant, the 
prepayment will fund about six years of premium payments.  As discussed in the Background section, 
these amounts represent the employer contribution of 0.45 percent of all appropriated positions 
within the state, which are appropriated through the “Paid Family Medical Leave Initiative” line 
within each agency budget.  
Other Budget Impacts 
The Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program is a state government enterprise, with revenue 
exempt from TABOR.  The fiscal note assumes that advance premium payments do not constitute 
grant funding for purposes of determining the program's enterprise status. 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect upon signature of the Governor, or upon becoming law without his signature.  
State Appropriations 
If this bill is passed after House Bill 22-1329, the FY 2022-23 Long Bill, it will requires a total reduction 
of $4,908,466 in the centrally appropriated Paid Family Medical Leave Initiative line items, distributed 
within each agency budget. If this bill is enacted prior to passage of the Long Bill, it is assumed that 
the required adjustments in appropriations for this bill can be made as adjustments to the Long Bill, 
rather than included as appropriations in this bill. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Information Technology Labor and Employment  
Personnel and Administration  Treasury 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.