Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1228 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 21, 2022
Fiscal Note February 22, 2022
Bill February 11, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2022
Bill March 3, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2022

Amended

Bill April 22, 2022
Bill April 21, 2022