04/07/2022 | Governor Signed | |||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
04/04/2022 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 04/01/2022 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |