Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1232 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 07/11/2022

                    Page 1 
July 11, 2022  HB 22-1232  
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 22-0317  
Rep. Valdez A.; Titone 
Sen. Gonzales 
 
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
July 11, 2022 
Signed into Law 
Clare Pramuk | 303-866-2677 
clare.pramuk@state.co.us  
Bill Topic: SUNSET CONTINUE REGULATION OF ASBESTOS  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☒ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
Sunset Bill. This bill continues the administration of the Asbestos Control Act by the 
Air Quality Control Commission in the Department of Public Health and Environment. 
It is currently set to repeal on September 1, 2022.  State fiscal impacts under the bill 
include only the continuation of the program's current revenue and expenditures.  The 
program is continued through September 1, 2027. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
No appropriation is required. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the enacted bill. 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 22-1232
1 
 
New Impacts 
Budget Year 
FY 2022-23 
Out Year 
FY 2023-24 
Revenue  	-       	-       
Expenditures  	-       	-       
Other Budget Impacts  	-       	-       
 
Continuing Impacts   
Revenue 	Cash Funds 	-       $1,903,215       
Expenditures 	Cash Funds 	-       $1,903,215       
 	Continuing FTE 	-       13.1 FTE      
Other Budget Impacts 
 
-       	-       
1
 Table 1 shows the new impacts resulting from changes to the program under the bill, and the continuing impacts 
from extending the program beyond its current repeal date.  Because the bill continues a program without making 
any changes, there are no new impacts.  The continuing program impacts will end if the bill is not passed and the 
program is allowed to repeal.   Page 2 
July 11, 2022  HB 22-1232  
 
Summary of Legislation 
The administration of the Asbestos Control Act by the Department of Public Health and Environment 
is set to expire September 1, 2022.  This bill continues the program until September 1, 2027, removes 
provisions that prohibit rules under the Act from being more restrictive than the laws and regulations 
under the federal Occupational Safety and Health Act; clarifies who requires certification in asbestos 
control, and requires local governments to include specific language regarding asbestos inspections 
on building permits.  
Background 
The Indoor Environment Program within the Air Pollution Control Division at the Colorado 
Department of Public Health and Environment is responsible for asbestos regulatory compliance in 
the state.  The program is authorized and obligated to enforce the federal National Emission Standards 
for Hazardous Air Pollutants regarding asbestos in public and commercial buildings, the federal 
Asbestos Hazard Emergency Response Act regarding asbestos in schools, and the federal Asbestos 
School Hazard Abatement Reauthorization Act, which extends certification requirements to public 
and commercial buildings.  Funding for asbestos control administration includes fees for permits for 
asbestos abatement and demolition and the testing and certification of individuals and companies 
involved in asbestos abatement activities.  The 2021 sunset review can be found here:  
https://drive.google.com/file/d/1XZzvJffxP6Aexxx0GwGX4l8gPUWTTFEd/view. 
Continuing Program Impacts 
Based on the department's FY 2022-23 budget request, the Department of Public Health and 
Environment is expected to have revenue and expenditures of $1,903,215 to administer the Asbestos 
Program, including the certification of asbestos control professionals.  If this bill is enacted, current 
revenue and expenditures will continue for the program starting in FY 2023-24. This continuing 
revenue is subject to the state TABOR limit. If this bill is not enacted, the program will end on 
September 1, 2023, following a wind-down period, and state revenue and expenditures will decrease 
starting in FY 2023 24 by the amounts shown in Table 1, above. 
Local Government  
When updating application forms for building permits, local governments will add the language 
specified in the bill, which may increase printing costs.   
Effective Date 
The bill was signed into law by the Governor on June 3, 2022, and takes effect August 9, 2022, assuming 
no referendum petition is filed. 
   Page 3 
July 11, 2022  HB 22-1232  
 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Counties Information Technology Law  
Municipalities  Public Health and Environment 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.