Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1232 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 11, 2022
Fiscal Note February 28, 2022
Bill February 11, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 4, 2022
Bill April 1, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2022

Amended

Bill April 26, 2022
Bill April 25, 2022