Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1240 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/01/2022

                    Page 1 
April 1, 2022   HB 22-1240  
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Revised Fiscal Note  
(replaces fiscal note dated February 28, 2022)  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 22-0201  
Rep. Froelich; Young 
Sen. Fields; Simpson  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
April 1, 2022  
House Appropriations  
Will Clark | 303-866-4720 
Will.Clark@state.co.us  
Bill Topic: MANDATORY REPORTERS  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill creates a mandatory reporter task force.  The bill increases state expenditures 
from FY 2022-23 through FY 2024-25. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2022-23, the bill requires an appropriation of $116,188 to the Office of the Child 
Protection Ombudsman. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
This revised fiscal note reflects the introduced bill, as amended by the House Judiciary 
Committee. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 22-1240 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2022-23 
Out Year 
FY 2023-24 
Out Year 
FY 2024-25 
Revenue  	- 	- 	- 
Expenditures 	General Fund $116,188  $126,750  $84,500  
Transfers  	- 	- 	- 
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve $17,428  $19,013  $12,675  
 
 
    Page 2 
April 1, 2022   HB 22-1240  
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill creates the Mandatory Reporter Task Force in the Office of the Child Protection Ombudsman 
(CPO) to analyze best practices and recommend changes to training requirements and reporting 
procedures, specifically with regard to the impacts of mandatory reporting on families of color, under-
resourced communities and people with disabilities.  The task force is made up of 33 members from 
state agencies, local government, and statewide organizations representing different community 
groups. The CPO must make appointments to the task force from a diverse range of member 
backgrounds and geographic locations.  To fulfill its duties, the task force must use national best 
practices and consult with appropriate stakeholders to analyze and make recommendations in a 
number of areas specified in the bill, including the parameters and funding for a study of mandatory 
reporting effectiveness; training for mandatory reporters; and reporting requirements and processes, 
among other things. 
 
The task force must convene by January 1, 2023, and meet at least every two months until it submits 
a final report to the General Assembly and the Governor. Meetings must be open to the public, and 
allow for public comments.  The task force must submit an initial status report with findings and 
recommendations by January 1, 2024, and submit its final report by January 1, 2025.   Lastly, the bill 
makes a technical correction to statute amended by HB 22-1295. 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in the CPO by $116,188 in FY 2022-23, by $126,750 in FY 2023-24 
and by $84,500 in FY 2024-25, paid from the General Fund, to create, facilitate and serve as chair of the 
Mandatory Reporter Task Force.   Expenditures are shown in Table 2. The fiscal note assumes the 
CPO will hire a contractor at $126,750 per year to help facilitate the task force.  The contractor will be 
responsible for coordinating and facilitating task force meetings; assisting with communications; 
developing and distributing materials in advance of meetings; preparing agendas and other 
administrative services; securing experts and stakeholders; developing and facilitating work groups; 
assisting with production and publication of reports; and helping with implementation of the task 
force’s final recommendations.  Costs in FY 2022-23 are prorated for an August 1
st
 start date and costs 
in FY 2024-25 are prorated for a February 28
th
 end date. 
 
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under HB 22-1240 
 
Cost Components 	FY 2022-23 FY 2023-24 FY 2024-25 
Office of the Child Protection Ombudsman              
Task Force Facilitation 	$116,188  $126,750  $84,500  
Total $116,188  $126,750  $84,500  
 
   Page 3 
April 1, 2022   HB 22-1240  
 
Other Budget Impacts 
General Fund reserve.  Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve beginning in FY 2022-23.  Based 
on this fiscal note, the bill is expected to increase the amount of General Fund held in reserve by the 
amounts shown in Table 1 above, which will decrease the amount of General Fund available for other 
purposes. 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect 90 days following adjournment of the General Assembly sine die, assuming no 
referendum petition is filed; except that Section 3 of the bill, concerning a technical fix to 
House Bill 22-1295, only takes effect if HB 22-1295 becomes law, in which case it takes effect on the 
effective date of this bill or HB 22-1295, whichever is later. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2022-23, the bill requires an appropriation of $116,188 to the Office of the Child Protection 
Ombudsman from the General Fund. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Counties District Attorneys  Education  
Health Care Policy and Financing  Higher Education  Human Services 
Information Technology Judicial  Law  
Local Affairs  Municipalities  Personnel  
Public Health and Environment Public Safety  Regulatory Agencies  
School Districts Sheriffs 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.