Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1240 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 2, 2022
Fiscal Note April 1, 2022
Fiscal Note February 28, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2022
Bill April 28, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2022

Amended

Bill May 9, 2022
Bill May 6, 2022