|
03/30/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
03/25/2022
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
|
|
|