Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1269 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 28, 2022
Fiscal Note March 30, 2022
Bill February 25, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2022
Bill April 21, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2022

Amended

Bill May 6, 2022
Bill April 25, 2022