Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1283 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 13, 2022
Fiscal Note April 26, 2022
Fiscal Note April 18, 2022
Fiscal Note March 25, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2022
Bill April 19, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2022

Amended

Bill May 9, 2022
Bill May 6, 2022