Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1285 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 28, 2022
Fiscal Note April 14, 2022
Fiscal Note April 11, 2022
Bill March 8, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2022
Bill April 23, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2022

Amended

Bill May 3, 2022
Bill May 2, 2022