Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1288 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note August 3, 2022
Fiscal Note March 14, 2022
Bill March 9, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2022
Bill March 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2022

Amended

Bill April 13, 2022
Bill April 12, 2022