Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1289 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 29, 2022
Fiscal Note April 26, 2022
Fiscal Note April 19, 2022
Fiscal Note March 31, 2022
Fiscal Note March 24, 2022
Bill March 9, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2022
Bill April 20, 2022

Enrolled

Bill June 2, 2022

Amended

Bill May 6, 2022
Bill May 4, 2022