Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1302 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 6, 2022
Fiscal Note April 14, 2022
Fiscal Note March 24, 2022
Bill March 16, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2022
Bill April 8, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2022

Amended

Bill May 9, 2022
Bill May 7, 2022