Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1304 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note August 8, 2022
Fiscal Note April 29, 2022
Fiscal Note April 27, 2022
Fiscal Note April 22, 2022
Fiscal Note April 4, 2022
Fiscal Note March 28, 2022
Bill March 16, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2022
Bill April 14, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2022

Amended

Bill May 6, 2022
Bill May 4, 2022