06/03/2022 | Governor Signed | |||
06/01/2022 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 06/01/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 06/01/2022 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 05/10/2022 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | ||
Senate | 05/09/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 05/06/2022 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
Senate | 05/06/2022 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations | ||
House | 05/02/2022 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/29/2022 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
House | 04/29/2022 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water |