Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1314 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 2, 2022
Fiscal Note April 25, 2022
Fiscal Note April 22, 2022
Fiscal Note April 5, 2022
Bill March 21, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2022
Bill April 28, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2022

Amended

Bill May 9, 2022
Bill May 6, 2022