Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1317 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note August 1, 2022
Fiscal Note April 25, 2022
Fiscal Note March 29, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2022
Bill April 14, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2022

Amended

Bill May 3, 2022
Bill May 2, 2022