04/25/2022 | Governor Signed | |||
04/22/2022 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 04/22/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/14/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/08/2022 - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations | ||
House | 04/02/2022 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |