06/08/2022 | Governor Signed | |||
06/06/2022 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 06/06/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 06/03/2022 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 05/10/2022 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | ||
Senate | 05/09/2022 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | ||
Senate | 04/29/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology | ||
House | 04/18/2022 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/13/2022 | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |