Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1348 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 12, 2022
Bill March 28, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2022
Bill April 26, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2022

Amended

Bill May 11, 2022
Bill May 10, 2022