|
06/03/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/31/2022
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
|
|
|