Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1369 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 18, 2022
Bill April 12, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2022
Bill April 27, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2022

Amended

Bill May 5, 2022
Bill May 4, 2022