Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1378 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 27, 2022
Fiscal Note May 2, 2022
Fiscal Note April 27, 2022
Fiscal Note April 25, 2022
Bill April 18, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2022
Bill April 28, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2022

Amended

Bill May 6, 2022