Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1379 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note August 5, 2022
Fiscal Note April 20, 2022
Bill April 18, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2022
Bill April 23, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2022

Amended

Bill April 29, 2022
Bill April 28, 2022