Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1393 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 28, 2022
Fiscal Note April 22, 2022
Bill April 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2022
Bill April 28, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2022

Amended

Bill May 9, 2022
Bill May 7, 2022