Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1400 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 26, 2022
Bill April 25, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill April 29, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2022

Amended

Bill May 10, 2022