Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1402 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 28, 2022
Bill April 26, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill April 29, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2022

Amended

Bill May 5, 2022
Bill May 4, 2022