Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1417 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 13, 2022
Fiscal Note May 4, 2022
Fiscal Note May 3, 2022
Bill May 2, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 10, 2022
Bill May 9, 2022