Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HJR1014 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/04/2022

                    Second Regular Session
Seventy-third General Assembly
STATE OF COLORADO
ENGROSSED
 
 
LLS NO. R22-0521.01 Andrew Webster x2044
HJR22-1014
House Committees Senate Committees
HOUSE JOINT RESOLUTION 22-1014 
C
ONCERNING THE DESIGNATION OF A PORTION OF COLORADO STATE101
H
IGHWAY 21 FROM KETTLE CREEK TO WOODMEN ROAD IN EL102
P
ASO COUNTY AS THE "SFC WILL LINDSAY MEMORIAL103
H
IGHWAY".104
WHEREAS, Will Lindsay was born on August 26, 1985, in1
Cortez, Colorado to Grant and Tammy Lindsay, graduating from2
Montezuma Cortez High School in 2004; and3
WHEREAS, Will joined the United States Army immediately after4
graduating high school, enlisting on July 7, 2004, and married the love of5
his life Sarah Unger in 2010, and together they had four daughters who6
were the center of their world; and7
WHEREAS, After completing Basic Training and Airborne8
HOUSE
 Final Reading
February 4, 2022
HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
Ortiz and Sandridge, Amabile, Bacon, Benavidez, Bernett, Bird, Bockenfeld,
Boesenecker, Bradfield, Caraveo, Carver, Catlin, Cutter, Daugherty, Esgar, Exum, Froelich,
Garnett, Geitner, Gonzales-Gutierrez, Gray, Hanks, Herod, Holtorf, Hooton, Jodeh, Kennedy,
Kipp, Larson, Lindsay, Lontine, Luck, Lynch, McCluskie, McCormick, McKean, McLachlan,
Michaelson Jenet, Mullica, Neville, Pelton, Pico, Ransom, Rich, Ricks, Roberts, Sirota,
Snyder, Soper, Sullivan, Tipper, Titone, Valdez A., Valdez D., Van Beber, Van Winkle,
Weissman, Will, Williams, Woodrow, Woog, Young
SENATE SPONSORSHIP
Lee and Liston, 
Shading denotes HOUSE amendment.  Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing statute.
Dashes through the words indicate deletions from existing statute. School, Will volunteered for and completed the Special Forces Selection1
and Qualification Courses, earning his Green Beret in July 2006, and was2
assigned to the 10th Special Forces Group (Airborne) at Fort Carson,3
Colorado as an Assistant Operations and Intelligence Sergeant with Alpha4
Company, 2nd Battalion; and5
WHEREAS, On February 6, 2019, Sergeant First Class (SFC) Will6
Lindsay deployed to Kunduz Province in Afghanistan in support of7
Freedom Sentinel VIII and XI, Operation Warhammer; and8
WHEREAS, The deployment had a high operational tempo, as the9
goal of Operation Warhammer was to establish peace in the region by10
bringing Al Qaeda to the negotiation table; and11
WHEREAS, On March 21, 2019, during operations in Kunduz12
City, SFC Lindsay's element came under heavy volumes of effective13
machine-gun and small-arms fire from multiple directions and from14
enemy positions as close as 25 meters from friendly locations; and15
WHEREAS, Under heavy contact and exposed with little cover,16
SFC Lindsay immediately directed his element to lay down suppressive17
fire and employ hand grenades against nearby enemy fighters to suppress18
the enemy firing positions; and19
WHEREAS, SFC Lindsay's element immediately sustained20
casualties from enemy machine-gun fire, and the detonation of an21
improvised explosive device (IED) rendered his machine gunners22
unconscious; and23
WHEREAS, Without hesitation and with full knowledge of the24
enemy threat, SFC Lindsay continually exposed himself to enemy fire to25
suppress enemy machine gunners with his individual weapon and hand26
grenades; and27
WHEREAS, SFC Lindsay's action provided covering fire for28
wounded personnel and medics attempting to establish a hasty casualty29
collection point to provide critical treatment; and30
WHEREAS, Realizing that his element contained multiple31
wounded in action and was in imminent danger of being destroyed by32
enemy machine-gun fire, SFC Lindsay completely exposed himself in the33
open to place more effective fire on the enemy and was wounded by34
1014
-2- enemy machine-gun fire; and1
WHEREAS, Despite having been wounded, SFC Lindsay bravely2
and selflessly maintained his position, suppressed the enemy forces, and3
coordinated the approach of friendly forces coming to his element's aid;4
and5
WHEREAS, In a final attempt to defeat the enemy, SFC Lindsay6
sprinted across an open road in an effort to mark enemy positions and7
regain the initiative from the Taliban and during this attempt, SFC8
Lindsay was mortally wounded; and9
WHEREAS, SFC Lindsay's conscious decision to continually10
expose himself to heavy volumes of fire from a determined, entrenched,11
and well-equipped enemy undoubtedly protected the lives of all within his12
element and directly contributed to the fatal wound he suffered; and13
WHEREAS, SFC Lindsay was killed in action when he14
succumbed to his wounds on March 21, 2019, in Talawka Village,15
Kunduz Province, Afghanistan; and16
WHEREAS, During his 15 years of service, SFC Lindsay deployed17
seven times: Five deployments to Iraq, one to Tajikistan in support of a18
counter-narcotics mission, and one to Afghanistan; and19
WHEREAS, SFC Lindsay's military decorations include the Silver20
Star Medal, four Bronze Star Medals, one Meritorious Service Medal, a21
Purple Heart, a Combat Infantryman's Badge, a Military Free Fall22
Jumpmaster Badge, and a Master Parachutist Badge; and23
WHEREAS, SFC Lindsay was a devoted husband, dedicated24
father, and true son of Colorado who held a deep love of hunting and25
fishing and working with his hands and would often shame his friends on26
the golf course with his mid-seventies game; now, therefore,27
Be It Resolved by the House of Representatives of the Seventy-third28
General Assembly of the State of Colorado, the Senate concurring herein:29
(1)  That a portion of Colorado State Highway 21 from Kettle30
Creek to Woodmen Road be named the "SFC Will Lindsay Memorial31
Highway" in honor of Sergeant First Class Will Lindsay's lifetime of32
honorable service and heroic sacrifice.33
1014
-3- (2)  That the Colorado Department of Transportation may accept1
and expend gifts, grants, and donations for the purposes of the initial2
placement of signs to mark the designated section of Colorado State3
Highway 21 as the "SFC Will Lindsay Memorial Highway".4
(3)  That the Colorado Department of Transportation may explore5
a cooperative agreement with the Board of County Commissioners for El6
Paso County for the maintenance of signs marking the "SFC Will Lindsay7
Memorial Highway".8
Be It Further Resolved, That copies of this Joint Resolution be sent9
to SFC Lindsay's wife, Sarah Unger, the Colorado Transportation10
Commission, the Department of Transportation, and the Special Forces11
Foundation (CO Branch).12
1014
-4-