Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HJR1014 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 Second Regular Session
22 Seventy-third General Assembly
33 STATE OF COLORADO
4-REVISED
4+ENGROSSED
55
66
77 LLS NO. R22-0521.01 Andrew Webster x2044
88 HJR22-1014
99 House Committees Senate Committees
1010 HOUSE JOINT RESOLUTION 22-1014
1111 C
1212 ONCERNING THE DESIGNATION OF A PORTION OF COLORADO STATE101
1313 H
1414 IGHWAY 21 FROM KETTLE CREEK TO WOODMEN ROAD IN EL102
1515 P
1616 ASO COUNTY AS THE "SFC WILL LINDSAY MEMORIAL103
1717 H
1818 IGHWAY".104
1919 WHEREAS, Will Lindsay was born on August 26, 1985, in1
2020 Cortez, Colorado to Grant and Tammy Lindsay, graduating from2
2121 Montezuma Cortez High School in 2004; and3
2222 WHEREAS, Will joined the United States Army immediately after4
2323 graduating high school, enlisting on July 7, 2004, and married the love of5
2424 his life Sarah Unger in 2010, and together they had four daughters who6
2525 were the center of their world; and7
2626 WHEREAS, After completing Basic Training and Airborne8
27-SENATE
28- Final Reading
29-February 7, 2022
3027 HOUSE
3128 Final Reading
3229 February 4, 2022
3330 HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
3431 Ortiz and Sandridge, Amabile, Bacon, Benavidez, Bernett, Bird, Bockenfeld,
3532 Boesenecker, Bradfield, Caraveo, Carver, Catlin, Cutter, Daugherty, Esgar, Exum, Froelich,
3633 Garnett, Geitner, Gonzales-Gutierrez, Gray, Hanks, Herod, Holtorf, Hooton, Jodeh, Kennedy,
3734 Kipp, Larson, Lindsay, Lontine, Luck, Lynch, McCluskie, McCormick, McKean, McLachlan,
3835 Michaelson Jenet, Mullica, Neville, Pelton, Pico, Ransom, Rich, Ricks, Roberts, Sirota,
3936 Snyder, Soper, Sullivan, Tipper, Titone, Valdez A., Valdez D., Van Beber, Van Winkle,
4037 Weissman, Will, Williams, Woodrow, Woog, Young
4138 SENATE SPONSORSHIP
42-Lee and Liston, Bridges, Buckner, Coleman, Cooke, Coram, Donovan, Fenberg, Fields,
43-Garcia, Gardner, Ginal, Gonzales, Hansen, Hisey, Holbert, Jaquez Lewis, Kirkmeyer, Kolker,
44-Lundeen, Moreno, Pettersen, Priola, Rankin, Rodriguez, Scott, Simpson, Smallwood,
45-Sonnenberg, Winter, Woodward, Zenzinger
39+Lee and Liston,
4640 Shading denotes HOUSE amendment. Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
4741 Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing statute.
4842 Dashes through the words indicate deletions from existing statute. School, Will volunteered for and completed the Special Forces Selection1
4943 and Qualification Courses, earning his Green Beret in July 2006, and was2
5044 assigned to the 10th Special Forces Group (Airborne) at Fort Carson,3
5145 Colorado as an Assistant Operations and Intelligence Sergeant with Alpha4
5246 Company, 2nd Battalion; and5
5347 WHEREAS, On February 6, 2019, Sergeant First Class (SFC) Will6
5448 Lindsay deployed to Kunduz Province in Afghanistan in support of7
5549 Freedom Sentinel VIII and XI, Operation Warhammer; and8
5650 WHEREAS, The deployment had a high operational tempo, as the9
5751 goal of Operation Warhammer was to establish peace in the region by10
5852 bringing Al Qaeda to the negotiation table; and11
5953 WHEREAS, On March 21, 2019, during operations in Kunduz12
6054 City, SFC Lindsay's element came under heavy volumes of effective13
6155 machine-gun and small-arms fire from multiple directions and from14
6256 enemy positions as close as 25 meters from friendly locations; and15
6357 WHEREAS, Under heavy contact and exposed with little cover,16
6458 SFC Lindsay immediately directed his element to lay down suppressive17
6559 fire and employ hand grenades against nearby enemy fighters to suppress18
6660 the enemy firing positions; and19
6761 WHEREAS, SFC Lindsay's element immediately sustained20
6862 casualties from enemy machine-gun fire, and the detonation of an21
6963 improvised explosive device (IED) rendered his machine gunners22
7064 unconscious; and23
7165 WHEREAS, Without hesitation and with full knowledge of the24
7266 enemy threat, SFC Lindsay continually exposed himself to enemy fire to25
7367 suppress enemy machine gunners with his individual weapon and hand26
7468 grenades; and27
7569 WHEREAS, SFC Lindsay's action provided covering fire for28
7670 wounded personnel and medics attempting to establish a hasty casualty29
7771 collection point to provide critical treatment; and30
7872 WHEREAS, Realizing that his element contained multiple31
7973 wounded in action and was in imminent danger of being destroyed by32
8074 enemy machine-gun fire, SFC Lindsay completely exposed himself in the33
8175 open to place more effective fire on the enemy and was wounded by34
8276 1014
8377 -2- enemy machine-gun fire; and1
8478 WHEREAS, Despite having been wounded, SFC Lindsay bravely2
8579 and selflessly maintained his position, suppressed the enemy forces, and3
8680 coordinated the approach of friendly forces coming to his element's aid;4
8781 and5
8882 WHEREAS, In a final attempt to defeat the enemy, SFC Lindsay6
8983 sprinted across an open road in an effort to mark enemy positions and7
9084 regain the initiative from the Taliban and during this attempt, SFC8
9185 Lindsay was mortally wounded; and9
9286 WHEREAS, SFC Lindsay's conscious decision to continually10
9387 expose himself to heavy volumes of fire from a determined, entrenched,11
9488 and well-equipped enemy undoubtedly protected the lives of all within his12
9589 element and directly contributed to the fatal wound he suffered; and13
9690 WHEREAS, SFC Lindsay was killed in action when he14
9791 succumbed to his wounds on March 21, 2019, in Talawka Village,15
9892 Kunduz Province, Afghanistan; and16
9993 WHEREAS, During his 15 years of service, SFC Lindsay deployed17
10094 seven times: Five deployments to Iraq, one to Tajikistan in support of a18
10195 counter-narcotics mission, and one to Afghanistan; and19
10296 WHEREAS, SFC Lindsay's military decorations include the Silver20
10397 Star Medal, four Bronze Star Medals, one Meritorious Service Medal, a21
10498 Purple Heart, a Combat Infantryman's Badge, a Military Free Fall22
10599 Jumpmaster Badge, and a Master Parachutist Badge; and23
106100 WHEREAS, SFC Lindsay was a devoted husband, dedicated24
107101 father, and true son of Colorado who held a deep love of hunting and25
108102 fishing and working with his hands and would often shame his friends on26
109103 the golf course with his mid-seventies game; now, therefore,27
110104 Be It Resolved by the House of Representatives of the Seventy-third28
111105 General Assembly of the State of Colorado, the Senate concurring herein:29
112106 (1) That a portion of Colorado State Highway 21 from Kettle30
113107 Creek to Woodmen Road be named the "SFC Will Lindsay Memorial31
114108 Highway" in honor of Sergeant First Class Will Lindsay's lifetime of32
115109 honorable service and heroic sacrifice.33
116110 1014
117111 -3- (2) That the Colorado Department of Transportation may accept1
118112 and expend gifts, grants, and donations for the purposes of the initial2
119113 placement of signs to mark the designated section of Colorado State3
120114 Highway 21 as the "SFC Will Lindsay Memorial Highway".4
121115 (3) That the Colorado Department of Transportation may explore5
122116 a cooperative agreement with the Board of County Commissioners for El6
123117 Paso County for the maintenance of signs marking the "SFC Will Lindsay7
124118 Memorial Highway".8
125119 Be It Further Resolved, That copies of this Joint Resolution be sent9
126120 to SFC Lindsay's wife, Sarah Unger, the Colorado Transportation10
127121 Commission, the Department of Transportation, and the Special Forces11
128122 Foundation (CO Branch).12
129123 1014
130124 -4-