Senate | 06/06/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 06/03/2022 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 04/21/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/21/2022 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to | ||
House | 04/21/2022 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/12/2022 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Introduced In House - Assigned to |