Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB001 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/25/2022

                    Page 1 
February 24, 2022  SB 22-001  
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Fiscal Note  
  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 22-0684  
Sen. Buckner; Garcia 
Rep. Ricks; Tipper  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
February 24, 2022 
Senate Local Government  
Josh Abram | 303-866-3561 
Josh.Abram@state.co.us  
Bill Topic: CRIME PREVENTION THROUGH SAFER STREETS  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☒ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill creates a grant program in the Department of Public Safety (DPS) to assist 
local governments in evaluating and designing safer streets and neighborhood models 
that discourage crime.  The bill increases state expenditures in FY 2022-23 only. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2022-23, the bill requires an appropriation of $10,300,000 to the Department 
of Public Safety. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under SB 22-001 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2022-23 
Out Year 
FY 2023-24 
Revenue  	-       	-       
Expenditures 	General Fund $10,300,000  
 	Centrally Appropriated 	$63,639  
 	Total Expenditures $10,363,639  
 	Total FTE 	2.0 FTE  
Transfers 
 
-       	-       
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve $1,545,000  
    Page 2 
February 24, 2022  SB 22-001  
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill creates the Crime Prevention Through Safer Streets Grant Program in the Department of 
Public Safety (DPS). The grant program is intended to assist the DPS and local governments to 
evaluate and design safer streets and neighborhood models that discourage crime.   
 
The DPS must issue a request for proposals (RFP) to local governments for the department to obtain 
an analysis identifying areas in the state where crime is most prevalent. Once these areas are 
identified, local governments may submit an application to DPS for a grant to pay for improvements 
designed to create safer streets.  DPS must develop policies and procedures for applications to and 
disbursements from the grant program. Before August 31, 2023, local government grantees must 
report grant activity to the DPS, who must summarize grant activity and report to the General 
Assembly by October 1, 2023. 
 
The bill creates the Crime Prevention Through Safer Streets Advisory Committee, with members 
appointed by the executive director of DPS.  At a minimum, committee membership must include 
representatives from law enforcement, experts in situational crime prevention, members of 
community organizations, individuals with expertise in urban or transportation planning, and an 
architect with experience in environmental design. Members serve without compensation or 
reimbursement of expenses.  The advisory committee makes recommendations to DPS for grantees 
and grant awards.  The General Assembly is required to appropriate $10.3 million from the General 
Fund for the grant program.   The bill is repealed November 1, 2023. 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in by $10.3 million in FY 2022-23 from the General Fund.  
Expenditures are shown in Table 2 and detailed below. 
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under SB 22-001 
 
 	FY 2022-23 FY 2023-24 
Department of Public Safety   
Personal Services 	$132,802      	-       
Operating Expenses 	$2,700        -       
Capital Outlay Costs 	$12,400       	-       
Consulting Services 	$130,000     	-       
Safer Streets Grants 	$10,022,098  
Centrally Appropriated Costs
1
 	$63,639       	-       
Total Cost $10,363,639 	-       
Total FTE 2.0 FTE 	-       
1
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. 
   
   Page 3 
February 24, 2022  SB 22-001  
 
Personal services. The DPS will have a one-time staffing increase in FY 2022-23 for a grant specialist 
to process payment requests and verify allowable expenses through the grant agreement and 
approved budget.  This position will also assist with the review of applications, budget proposals, and 
the execution of grant agreements.  A financial grant specialist is needed to provide ongoing financial 
technical assistance to grantees, and to conduct onsite visits for grant compliance. 
 
Consulting services. The DPS will contract for two consultants; one to provide technical assistance 
to the department and local governments to assist with the identification and conceptual design phase 
of potential projects and improvements to create safer streets; and one to assist with the development 
and review of the RFP.  
 
Safer streets grants. After administrative expenses, about $10.02 million remains available for 
awarding grants in FY 2022-23. 
 
Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs associated 
with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally appropriated in the Long 
Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill.  These costs, which include employee 
insurance, supplemental employee retirement payments, and an indirect cost assessment, are shown 
in Table 2. 
Other Budget Impacts 
General Fund reserve. Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve beginning in FY 2022-23.  The 
bill is expected to increase the amount of General Fund held in reserve by $1,545,000 in FY 2022-23, 
which will decrease the amount of General Fund available for other purposes. 
Local Government  
Local governments that receive grants will have an increase in both revenue and expenditures. 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect upon signature of the Governor, or upon becoming law without his signature. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2022-23, the bill requires a General Fund appropriation of $10,300,000 to the Department of 
Public Safety, and 2.0 FTE. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Law  Public Safety 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.