Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB001 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 25, 2022
Bill January 12, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 25, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 9, 2022

Amended

Bill April 29, 2022
Bill April 27, 2022