Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB018 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 24, 2022
Fiscal Note February 11, 2022
Fiscal Note February 1, 2022
Bill January 12, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2022
Bill March 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 6, 2022

Amended

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill April 30, 2022