Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB081 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 22, 2022
Fiscal Note February 11, 2022
Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill April 29, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2022

Amended

Bill May 11, 2022