|
06/08/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/18/2022
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
|
|
|
|
05/03/2022
|
First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2022
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/22/2022 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
|
|
|