Second Regular Session Seventy-third General Assembly STATE OF COLORADO REVISED This Version Includes All Amendments Adopted on Second Reading in the Second House LLS NO. 22-0700.01 Jennifer Berman x3286 SENATE BILL 22-110 Senate Committees House Committees State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Energy & Environment A BILL FOR AN ACT C ONCERNING A REQUIREMENT THAT A WIND -POWERED ENERGY101 GENERATION FACILITY BE EQUI PPED WITH LIGHT MITIGATING 102 TECHNOLOGY.103 Bill Summary (Note: This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at http://leg.colorado.gov .) The bill requires that, on or before September 1, 2024, an owner or operator of a wind-powered energy generation facility (facility) that is required to obtain a land-use permit from a local government equip the facility with an aircraft detection lighting system (system). The bill defines a system as a sensor-based system that is designed to detect HOUSE Amended 2nd Reading April 22, 2022 SENATE 3rd Reading Unamended March 25, 2022 SENATE Amended 2nd Reading March 24, 2022 SENATE SPONSORSHIP Sonnenberg and Kolker, Bridges, Coleman, Cooke, Donovan, Fenberg, Fields, Ginal, Hansen, Hisey, Holbert, Jaquez Lewis, Kirkmeyer, Liston, Lundeen, Moreno, Rankin, Scott, Simpson, Smallwood, Woodward HOUSE SPONSORSHIP Pelton, Shading denotes HOUSE amendment. Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment. Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing statute. Dashes through the words indicate deletions from existing statute. approaching aircraft and that meets federal aviation administration requirements. An owner or operator of a facility is solely responsible for the costs of installing, operating, or maintaining a system and may request from the governing body of the local government an extension of time up to one year to equip a facility with a system. A local government may revoke an existing land-use permit or, if an application for permit renewal is pending, refuse to renew a land-use permit if a facility owner or operator fails to comply with the bill. The board of county commissioners in the county in which a facility is located may adopt and enforce an ordinance or resolution to authorize the board to impose civil penalties against a facility owner or operator if the board determines that the owner or operator has failed to comply with the bill. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1 SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, add 38-30.7-106 as2 follows:3 38-30.7-106. Wind-powered energy generation facilities4 inclusion of light mitigating technology - requirement - enforcement 5 - definitions. (1) (a) S UBJECT TO SUBSECTION (1)(b) OF THIS SECTION 6 AND SUBJECT TO APPROVAL FROM THE FAA FOR THE INSTALLATION OF7 APPROVED LIGHT MITIGATING TECHNOLOGY , FOR ANY NEW8 WIND-POWERED ENERGY GENERATION FACILITY THAT IS SUBJECT TO9 LOCAL GOVERNMENT LAND -USE PERMITTING REQUIREMENTS PURSUANT10 TO SECTION 29-20-108 OR IS OWNED BY AN INDEPENDENT POWER11 PRODUCER, AND FOR WHICH THE OWNER OR OPERATOR OF THE NEW12 FACILITY BEGINS VERTICAL CONSTRUCTION OF THE FIRST WIND TURBINE13 INCLUDED WITHIN THE FACILITY ON OR AFTER APRIL 1, 2022, THE OWNER14 OR OPERATOR SHALL INSTALL LIGHT MITIGATING TECHNOLOGY AT THE15 NEW FACILITY.16 (b) T HE OWNER OR OPERATOR OF A NEW WIND-POWERED ENERGY17 GENERATION FACILITY SUBJECT TO SUBSECTION (1)(a) OF THIS SECTION,18 WITHIN SIX MONTHS AFTER THE FACILITY RECEIVES A DETERMINATION OF19 110-2- NO HAZARD FROM THE FAA, SHALL:1 (I) A PPLY TO THE FAA, ANY OTHER APPLICABLE FEDERAL 2 AGENCY, OR BOTH, FOR THE INSTALLATION OF APPROVED LIGHT3 MITIGATING TECHNOLOGY ; AND4 (II) W ITHIN TWENTY-FOUR MONTHS AFTER RECEIVING APPROVAL 5 FROM THE FAA IN ACCORDANCE WITH SUBSECTION (1)(b)(I) OF THIS6 SECTION, AND SUBJECT TO THE AVAILABILITY OF LIGHT MITIGATING7 TECHNOLOGY FROM THE MANUFACTURER OR SUPPLIER , INSTALL, TEST,8 AND COMMENCE OPERATION , CONSISTENT WITH FAA REQUIREMENTS OR9 OTHER APPLICABLE FEDERAL AGENCY REQUIREMENTS , OF THE LIGHT10 MITIGATING TECHNOLOGY AT THE NEW FACILITY .11 (2) T HE OWNER OR OPERATOR OF A WIND -POWERED ENERGY12 GENERATION FACILITY MAY SEEK AN EXTENSION OF TIME FROM THE13 GOVERNING BODY OF THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT TO COMPLY WITH14 SUBSECTION (1) OF THIS SECTION FOR A PERIOD OF UP TO TWENTY-FOUR 15 MONTHS. THE GOVERNING BODY OF THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT SHALL16 GRANT THE REQUEST IF THE OWNER OR OPERATOR CAN DEMONSTRATE17 THAT, DESPITE THE OWNER'S OR OPERATOR'S EXERCISE OF COMMERCIALLY18 REASONABLE EFFORTS , THE AVAILABILITY OF LIGHT MITIGATING19 TECHNOLOGY CONSTRAINED THE OWNER 'S OR OPERATOR'S ABILITY TO20 COMPLY WITH SUBSECTION (1) OF THIS SECTION IN THE TIME FRAME21 AFFORDED. A BOARD SHALL NOT IMPOSE ANY PENALTIES AGAINST THE22 OWNER OR OPERATOR PURSUANT TO SUBSECTION (3) OF THIS SECTION23 DURING THE EXTENSION PERIOD GRANTED .24 (3) I F THE BOARD HAS EXERCISED ITS AUTHORITY TO ENACT AN 25 ORDINANCE OR RESOLUTION TO IMPOSE CIVIL PENALTIES PURSUANT TO26 SECTION 30-11-130 AND DETERMINES THAT AN OWNER OR OPERATOR OF27 110 -3- A WIND-POWERED ENERGY GENERATION FACILITY WAS REQUIRED TO , BUT1 FAILED TO, COMPLY WITH THIS SECTION, THE BOARD MAY IMPOSE A CIVIL2 PENALTY ON THE OWNER OR OPERATOR OF THE NEW FACILITY IN THE3 AMOUNT OF ONE THOUSAND DOLLARS PER DAY .4 (4) THIS SECTION DOES NOT APPLY TO WIND-POWERED ENERGY5 GENERATION FACILITIES USED SOLELY FOR PURPOSES OF RESEARCH AND6 TESTING.7 (5) AS USED IN THIS SECTION, UNLESS THE CONTEXT OTHERWISE8 REQUIRES:9 (a) "A PPROVAL FROM THE FAA" MEANS FAA APPROVAL TO EQUIP 10 AND OPERATE LIGHT MITIGATING TECHNOLOGY FOR AT LEAST THIRTY11 PERCENT OF THE PROPOSED WIND TURBINES INCLUDED WITHIN A NEW12 WIND-POWERED ENERGY GENERATION FACILITY .13 (b) "B OARD" MEANS THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS IN14 THE COUNTY IN WHICH A WIND-POWERED ENERGY GENERATION FACILITY15 IS LOCATED OR WILL BE LOCATED.16 (c) "FAA" MEANS THE FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION IN THE 17 U NITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION . 18 (d) "L IGHT MITIGATING TECHNOLOGY " MEANS A SENSOR-BASED 19 SYSTEM THAT:20 (I) I S DESIGNED TO DETECT APPROACHING AIRCRAFT ; 21 (II) K EEPS THE LIGHTS OFF WHEN IT IS SAFE TO DO SO; AND 22 (III) T HE FAA HAS APPROVED AS MEETING THE REQUIREMENTS 23 SET FORTH IN CHAPTER 10 OF THE FAA'S 2020 ADVISORY CIRCULAR AC24 70/7460-1M, "OBSTRUCTION MARKING AND LIGHTING". 25 (e) "LOCAL GOVERNMENT" MEANS A COUNTY OR A HOME RULE OR26 STATUTORY CITY, TOWN, TERRITORIAL CHARTER CITY , OR CITY AND27 110 -4- COUNTY.1 (f) "WIND-POWERED ENERGY GENERATION FACILITY " OR2 " FACILITY" MEANS A FACILITY USED IN THE GENERATION OF ELECTRICITY3 BY MEANS OF TURBINES OR OTHER DEVICES THAT CAPTURE AND EMPLOY 4 THE KINETIC ENERGY OF THE WIND.5 SECTION 2. In Colorado Revised Statutes, add 30-11-130 as6 follows:7 30-11-130. Equipping wind-powered energy generation8 facilities with light mitigating technology - enforcement - definitions.9 (1) A BOARD MAY ADOPT AND ENFORCE AN ORDINANCE OR RESOLUTION10 AUTHORIZING THE BOARD TO IMPOSE A CIVIL PENALTY ON THE OWNER OR11 OPERATOR OF A NEW WIND-POWERED ENERGY GENERATION FACILITY IN12 THE AMOUNT OF ONE THOUSAND DOLLARS PER DAY IF THE BOARD13 DETERMINES THAT THE OWNER OR OPERATOR OF THE FACILITY WAS14 REQUIRED TO, BUT FAILED TO, COMPLY WITH SECTION 38-30.7-106.15 (2) O NE OR MORE CONTIGUOUS COUNTIES AND ANY MUNICIPALITY16 WITHIN EACH COUNTY MAY ENTER INTO AN INTERGOVERNMENTAL17 AGREEMENT TO EXTEND THE APPLICABILITY OF ANY ORDINANCE OR18 RESOLUTION ADOPTED UNDER THIS SECTION TO AND THROUGHOUT A19 PARTICIPATING COUNTY OR MUNICIPALITY .20 (3) A S USED IN THIS SECTION, UNLESS THE CONTEXT OTHERWISE21 REQUIRES:22 (a) "B OARD" MEANS THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS IN23 THE COUNTY IN WHICH A WIND-POWERED ENERGY GENERATION FACILITY24 IS LOCATED OR WILL BE LOCATED.25 (b) "W IND-POWERED ENERGY GENERATION FACILITY " OR26 " FACILITY" MEANS A FACILITY, WITH A NAMEPLATE CAPACITY OF ONE27 110 -5- MEGAWATT OR GREATER, USED IN THE GENERATION OF ELECTRICITY BY1 MEANS OF TURBINES OR OTHER DEVICES THAT CAPTURE AND EMPLOY THE2 KINETIC ENERGY OF THE WIND.3 SECTION 3. Act subject to petition - effective date. This act4 takes effect at 12:01 a.m. on the day following the expiration of the5 ninety-day period after final adjournment of the general assembly; except6 that, if a referendum petition is filed pursuant to section 1 (3) of article V7 of the state constitution against this act or an item, section, or part of this8 act within such period, then the act, item, section, or part will not take9 effect unless approved by the people at the general election to be held in10 November 2022 and, in such case, will take effect on the date of the11 official declaration of the vote thereon by the governor.12 110 -6-