|
06/03/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/18/2022
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to Finance
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
|
|
|