House | 05/09/2022 | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 05/09/2022 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 05/05/2022 | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Unamended to Finance | ||
House | 04/22/2022 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment | ||
Senate | 04/22/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/21/2022 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |