04/13/2022 | Governor Signed | |||
04/06/2022 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 04/06/2022 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |