|
06/02/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2022
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
|
|
|