Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB159 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 27, 2022
Fiscal Note April 4, 2022
Bill March 17, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2022
Bill April 22, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2022

Amended

Bill May 9, 2022
Bill May 3, 2022