Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB168 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 07/21/2022

                    Page 1 
July 21, 2022  SB 22-168  
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 22-0913  
Sen. Donovan; Rankin 
Rep. McCluskie; Will  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
July 21, 2022 
Signed into Law 
Josh Abram | 303-866-3561 
Josh.Abram@state.co.us  
Bill Topic: BACKCOUNTRY SEARCH & RESCUE  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☒ State Transfer 
☒ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
Effective January 1, 2023, the bill transfers the Backcountry Search and Rescue 
Program from the Department of Local Affairs to Colorado Parks and Wildlife (CPW).  
The bill transfers funds for use by CPW through FY 2024-25 to support backcountry 
search and rescue, 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2022-23, the bill requires that cash fund appropriations to the Department of 
Local Affairs be reduced by $314,123. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the enacted bill. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under SB 22-168 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2022-23 
Out Year 
FY 2023-24 
Revenue 	Cash Funds – CPW $300,000       $600,000       
 	Cash Funds – DOLA ($300,000)               ($600,000)               
 	Total Revenue 	$0        	$0        
Expenditures 	Cash Funds – CPW $1,314,123  $628,246  
 	Cash Funds – DOLA ($314,123)               ($628,246)               
 	Total Expenditures 	$0        	$0        
Transfers 	General Fund ($1,000,000)        	-        
 	Cash Funds $1,000,000 	-              
 	Net Transfer 	$0 	-       
Other Budget Impacts  	-        	-        
 
   Page 2 
July 21, 2022  SB 22-168  
 
Summary of Legislation 
Effective January 1, 2023, this bill transfers the functions of the Department of Local Affairs (DOLA) 
related to backcountry search and rescue to Colorado Parks and Wildlife (CPW) in the Department of 
Natural Resources.  All staff and appropriations to DOLA related to the backcountry search and rescue 
card program and the related cash fund are transferred to CPW. 
 
On or after January 1, 2023, the Parks and Wildlife Commission is required to establish by rule, the 
price and vendor fee for the backcountry search and rescue card, and the surcharge on other licenses 
that is credited to the program cash fund.  Under current law, these amounts are set in statute.  
 
The bill extends the existing immunity from civil liability for volunteer firefighters and incident 
management teams to individuals engaged in backcountry search and rescue efforts. Finally, this bill 
makes a dependent of a person who died or was permanently disabled while engaged in backcountry 
search and rescue efforts eligible for free tuition and room and board assistance at public institutions 
of higher education. 
State Transfers 
For FY 2022-23, the bill requires a transfer of $1.0 million from the General Fund to the Wildlife Cash 
Fund for use by CPW to support backcountry search and rescue.  On January 2, 2023, any unobligated 
and unexpended money is transferred to the Backcountry Search and Rescue Fund. 
State Revenue and Expenditures 
The bill decreases cash fund revenue and expenditures in the DOLA and increases revenue and 
expenditures by the same amount in CPW.  For FY 2022-23, DOLA’s budget request for spending 
authority from the Backcountry Search and Rescue Cash Fund is $628,246 and 1.3 FTE.  The fund is 
subject to annual appropriations. 
 
The bill transfers the program and cash fund on January 1, 2023, half way through FY 2022-23.  For 
this reason, DOLA’s expenditures for FY 2022-23 are reduced by approximately $314,123 and CPW’s 
expenditures increase by the same amount. The program cash fund receives about $600,000 annually 
in revenue from card sales and license surcharges.  CPW is a state enterprise, and revenue into the 
Backcountry Search and Rescue Cash Fund after January 1, 2023, is exempt from TABOR.  The fund 
is continuously appropriated to CPW and will no longer requires annual appropriations by the 
General Assembly.     
 
The CPW will have a one-time cost of for computer programming from the Office of Information 
Technology (OIT).  The division must update its Integrated Parks and Wildlife System to transition 
the database tracking systems, and for maintenance and hosting costs.  Estimated at about $50,000, 
these costs will be covered within existing resources and do not require new appropriations. 
 
Institutions of higher education must make education benefits available to dependents of persons who 
died or were permanently disabled while engaged in backcountry search and rescue efforts.  This cost 
is not estimated.  Page 3 
July 21, 2022  SB 22-168  
 
Other Budget Impacts 
TABOR refunds. Preliminarily, the fiscal note assumes that transferring the Backcountry Search and 
Rescue Program to CPW will be treated similarly to the qualification of a new enterprise under 
TABOR.  This will result in a corresponding adjustment to the Referendum C cap equal to the revenue 
being shifted into the enterprise, and the bill will not impact the state’s TABOR refund obligation.  
Effective Date 
The bill was signed into law by the Governor and took effect June 1, 2022.  
State Appropriations 
For FY 2022-23, the bill includes the following appropriations: 
 
 Cash fund appropriations to the Department of Local Affairs from the Backcountry Search and 
Rescue Cash Fund are reduced by $314,123; and 
 
 $1,000,000 is appropriated from the Wildlife Cash fund to the Department of Natural Resources 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Information Technology Law      Local Affairs 
Natural Resources  Personnel 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.