Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB168 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 21, 2022
Fiscal Note March 29, 2022
Bill March 21, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2022
Bill April 22, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 9, 2022

Amended

Bill May 3, 2022
Bill May 2, 2022