Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB173 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 10, 2022
Fiscal Note April 29, 2022
Fiscal Note April 12, 2022
Fiscal Note March 31, 2022
Bill March 23, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2022
Bill April 26, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2022

Amended

Bill May 11, 2022