Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB176 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/06/2022

                    Page 1 
April 5, 2022   SB 22-176  
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Fiscal Note  
  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 22-0968  
Sen. Hansen; Rankin 
  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
April 5, 2022  
Senate Appropriations  
Will Clark | 303-866-4720 
Will.Clark@state.co.us  
Bill Topic: EARLY STAGE FRONT RANGE PASSENGER RAIL FUNDING  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☒ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☒ Local Government 
☒ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill makes a transfer from the General Fund to two cash funds for development of 
the front range passenger rail corridor. The bill increases state expenditures in 
FY 2022-23 through FY 2024-25, and increases ongoing expenditures in a statutory 
public entity starting in the current FY 2021-22. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
No appropriation is required as the State Highway Fund is continuously appropriated 
to the Department of Transportation. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under SB 22-176 
 
  
Current Year 
FY 2021-22 
Budget Year 
FY 2022-23 
Out Year 
FY 2023-24 
Revenue  	-     -     -     
Expenditures 	Cash Funds 	-     $2,170,000     $2,170,000     
 	Total Expenditures 	- $2,170,000 $2,170,000 
Transfers 	General Fund ($2,400,000)     ($6,500,000)
1
      -     
 	Cash Funds $2,400,000 $6,500,000 	- 
 Net Transfer $0 $0 	- 
Other Budget Impacts  	-     -     -     
  
1
 Funding transferred in FY 2022-23 will be spent over a period of three years starting in FY 2022-23, with around 
$2.2 million per year spent on development of the Burnham Yard property through FY 2024-25. See State Expenditures 
section for more detail. 
   Page 2 
April 5, 2022   SB 22-176  
 
Summary of Legislation 
The Front Range Passenger Rail District was established by Senate Bill 21-238 to implement an 
interconnected passenger rail system along the Interstate 25 corridor.  This bill transfers money from 
the General Fund to support development of the Front Range Passenger Rail corridor, including 
funding for rail district operations and to develop the Burnham Yard property, which will be used to 
consolidate and expand rail lines in the Front Range Passenger Rail corridor through Denver.  
Development of the Burnham Yard property will include conceptual design work, analysis of impacts 
to surrounding communities, and stakeholder engagement related to moving the existing rail line.  
This work is required by the Federal Railroad Administration before a full National Environmental 
Policy Act analysis can occur. 
State Transfers 
The bill makes General Fund transfers of $2.4 million in FY 2021-22 and $6.5 million in FY 2022-23 to 
fund development of the Front Range Passenger Rail corridor, as shown in Table 2 and discussed 
below. 
 
Table 2 
Transfers Under SB 22-176 
 
  
Current Year 
FY 2021-22 
Budget Year 
FY 2022-23 
General Fund 	($2,400,000) ($6,500,000) 
Southwest Chief Rail Line Economic Development, Rural 
Tourism, and Infrastructure Repair and Maintenance Fund 
/ Front Range Passenger Rail District Fund 
$2,400,000 	- 
State Highway Fund 	-  $6,500,000 
Net Transfer 	$0 	$0 
 
The bill transfers $2.4 million to the Southwest Chief Rail Line Economic Development, Rural 
Tourism, and Infrastructure Repair and Maintenance Fund on June 15, 2022, from the General Fund.  
On June 30, 2022, the remaining fund balance is transferred to the Front Range Passenger Rail District, 
and the fund repeals July 1, 2022. The bill also transfers $6.5 million to the State Highway Fund on 
July 1, 2022 for CDOT to develop the Burnham Yard Rail Property.  
State Expenditures 
The bill increases State Highway Fund expenditures in CDOT by $6.5 million over a three-year period 
starting in FY 2022-23 to develop the Burnham Yard property for use by the Front Range Passenger 
Rail corridor. Costs include conducting public outreach, an environmental analysis, preliminary 
engineering, surveying and utilities investigation, railroad coordination, geotechnical investigation 
and project management.  CDOT workload will be accomplished using 3.0 FTE of existing staff.  Funds 
in the State Highway Fund are continuously appropriated to CDOT.  Page 3 
April 5, 2022   SB 22-176  
 
Local Government 
Workload will increase for local governments to the extent that development of the Front Range 
Passenger Rail corridor and the Burnham Yard property require coordination with CDOT and the 
Front Range Passenger Rail District. 
Statutory Public Entity 
The Front Range Passenger Rail District, an independent political subdivision of the state, is 
responsible for researching, developing, constructing, operating and maintaining an interconnected 
passenger rail system along the Front Range.  For FY 2021-22, revenue will increase in the Front Range 
Passenger Rail District by $2.4 million to provide funding for matching grants from the federal 
government.  This funding will be used on an ongoing basis to develop the district’s rail service 
development plan, operations plan, and Front Range Passenger Rail District financial plan. 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect upon signature of the Governor, or upon becoming law without his signature. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Counties Information Technology 
Municipalities  Regional Transportation District 
Transportation  Treasury 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.